NY A06534 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides state assistance to the counties of Cayuga and Seneca in which an Indian nation is located.
Title
Provides state assistance to the counties of Cayuga and Seneca in which an Indian nation is located.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | print number 6534a |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02567 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES