NY A06515 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-22 - print number 6515a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-22 - print number 6515a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to adopt rules and regulations requiring the issuance and placement of special stickers identifying alternative fuel vehicles having a gross vehicle weight of ten thousand pounds or less; requires such stickers to be easily identifiable to first responders as alternative fuel vehicles; defines alternative fuel.
Title
Requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to adopt rules and regulations requiring the issuance and placement of special stickers identifying alternative fuel vehicles having a gross vehicle weight of ten thousand pounds or less; requires such stickers to be easily identifiable to first responders as alternative fuel vehicles; defines alternative fuel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | print number 6515a |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S09478 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 9478A