NY A06515 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides aid for blind or deaf students in relation to the purchase and use of supports for the education of students who are blind, deaf, deaf-blind or hard of hearing.
Title
Provides aid for blind or deaf students in relation to the purchase and use of supports for the education of students who are blind, deaf, deaf-blind or hard of hearing.
Sponsors
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.350 |
2017-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2122 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4831A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.539 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.539 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | print number 6515a |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04831 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6515A