NY A06512 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 6512a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 6512a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the nuclear power plant disaster preparedness plans study.
Title
Establishes the nuclear power plant disaster preparedness plans study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 6512a |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05267 (Same As) 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5267A