NY A06510 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.290
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Removes the ten year limitation for real property tax exemptions for cold war veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes the ten year limitation for real property tax exemptions for cold war veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-12Senatesigned chap.290
2017-08-31Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1895
2017-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5659A
2017-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.116
2017-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.116
2017-06-07Assemblyreported
2017-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-09Assemblyprint number 6510a
2017-05-09Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2017-04-25Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-03-07Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S05659 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6510A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06510&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06510&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06510
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06510&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06510A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06510&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06510&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06510&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06510&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6510#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback