NY A06508 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - signed chap.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - signed chap.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to installment loans and obligations evidencing installment loans.
Title
Relates to extending the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to installment loans and obligations evidencing installment loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | signed chap.46 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.583 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5384 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.299 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05384 (Same As) 2017-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6508