NY A06506 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - approval memo.30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - approval memo.30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the office of mental health to provide monthly status reports of the community investments and the impact on inpatient census to the chair of the senate finance committee and the chair of the assembly ways and means committee and to post such report on the office's website.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the office of mental health to provide monthly status reports of the community investments and the impact on inpatient census to the chair of the senate finance committee and the chair of the assembly ways and means committee and to post such report on the office's website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | approval memo.30 |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | signed chap.646 |
2022-11-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-03-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.529 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4253 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.217 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.584 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.584 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S04253 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6506