NY A06492 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s3100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s3100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing performance of duty disability retirement benefits for the employee titles police medic, police medic supervisor, police medic coordinator, bureau director emergency ambulance, and deputy bureau director emergency ambulance in the employ of Nassau county.
Title
Relates to providing performance of duty disability retirement benefits for the employee titles police medic, police medic supervisor, police medic coordinator, bureau director emergency ambulance, and deputy bureau director emergency ambulance in the employ of Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s3100 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.452 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03100 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.528