NY A06477 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contribution and receipt limitations applicable to candidates for election to any public office.
Title
Relates to contribution and receipt limitations applicable to candidates for election to any public office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.212 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.212 |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S09558 (Same As) 2022-09-16 - REFERRED TO RULES