NY A06474 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s5724a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the rate of interest on money judgments in actions involving consumer debt where the defendant is a natural person shall be calculated at a rate of two percent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the rate of interest on money judgments in actions involving consumer debt where the defendant is a natural person shall be calculated at a rate of two percent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted by s5724a
2021-06-03Assemblyamended on third reading 6474a
2021-05-06Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.328
2021-05-04Assemblyreported
2021-03-18Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S05724 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback