NY A06473 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the occupancy tax in the village of Tuckahoe until September 1, 2022.
Title
Extends the occupancy tax in the village of Tuckahoe until September 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.210 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.367 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6473 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.504 |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5082 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.367 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.367 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05082 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.210