NY A06466 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health and motor vehicle insurance policies to notify policyholders of cancellation, discontinuance or major changes to their policy via email and to offer paperless notification upon the issuance of such policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health and motor vehicle insurance policies to notify policyholders of cancellation, discontinuance or major changes to their policy via email and to offer paperless notification upon the issuance of such policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.238
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.151
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.151
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-07Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S08885 (Same As) 2020-08-07 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback