NY A06462 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changes New York state history month from November to October.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes New York state history month from November to October.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.1034
2019-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5369
2019-05-01SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
2019-05-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-01Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.208
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-03-07Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development

Same As/Similar To

S05369 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6462

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback