NY A06454 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases state funding for construction and improvement by the department of transportation where the municipality agrees to fund a complete street design feature as a component of the project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases state funding for construction and improvement by the department of transportation where the municipality agrees to fund a complete street design feature as a component of the project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-16Assemblyprint number 6454a
2019-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2019-03-07Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S04414 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback