NY A06426 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - substituted by s6177b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - substituted by s6177b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from New York Jesus Baptist Church with respect to the 2022-2023 assessment roll for all of the 2022-2023 school taxes and all of the 2023 general taxes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from New York Jesus Baptist Church with respect to the 2022-2023 assessment roll for all of the 2022-2023 school taxes and all of the 2023 general taxes.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s6177b |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.882 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | print number 6426b |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | print number 6426a |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06177 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.443