NY A06426 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - signed chap.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - signed chap.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the district superintendent of the Eastport-South Manor central school district to adjust certain improper apportionments of school tax levy which occurred in the 2019-2020 tax year over the next two tax years (2020-2021 and 2021-2022) and validating certain acts by the Eastport-South Manor Central School District in connection with adjustment of the improper apportionment of the school tax levy in 2019-2020.
Title
Authorizes the district superintendent of the Eastport-South Manor central school district to adjust certain improper apportionments of school tax levy which occurred in the 2019-2020 tax year over the next two tax years (2020-2021 and 2021-2022) and validating certain acts by the Eastport-South Manor Central School District in connection with adjustment of the improper apportionment of the school tax levy in 2019-2020.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Assembly | signed chap.453 |
2021-09-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1647 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5750 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.349 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.349 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05750 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6426