NY A06424 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a claim-filing opportunity for the widows and dependents of workers who died as a result of cancer caused by exposure to diesel exhaust.
Title
Provides a claim-filing opportunity for the widows and dependents of workers who died as a result of cancer caused by exposure to diesel exhaust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s661 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.666 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.666 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00661 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.526