NY A06405 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the pay and allowances of members of the militia.
Title
Relates to increasing the pay and allowances of members of the militia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | print number 6405a |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00937 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE