NY A06399 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-28 - print number 6399c
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-28 - print number 6399c
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for automatic sealing of certain convictions after a certain passage of time from either imposition of sentence, release from parole or probation, and if the defendant does not have a current charge pending; excludes certain offenses; permits access by certain persons.
Title
Provides for automatic sealing of certain convictions after a certain passage of time from either imposition of sentence, release from parole or probation, and if the defendant does not have a current charge pending; excludes certain offenses; permits access by certain persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-28 | Assembly | print number 6399c |
2022-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | print number 6399b |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | print number 6399a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01553 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to codes