NY A06393 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of labor, in consultation with the education department, the office of temporary and disability assistance, the office of children and family services, and any other entity the department deems appropriate, to produce a report regarding summer youth employment programs funded by state, federal and local appropriations.
Title
Requires the department of labor, in consultation with the education department, the office of temporary and disability assistance, the office of children and family services, and any other entity the department deems appropriate, to produce a report regarding summer youth employment programs funded by state, federal and local appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.18 |
2020-11-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.297 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6393 |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2020-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.239 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-05-20 | Senate | referred to labor |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.598 |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s1079 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.165 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01079 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.18