NY A06389 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - signed chap.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - signed chap.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to bonds and notes of the city of Yonkers.
Title
Relates to bonds and notes of the city of Yonkers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | signed chap.44 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.124 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1759 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.297 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S01759 (Same As) 2017-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6389