NY A06387 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - substituted by s6147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authorization of the county of Cattaraugus to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authorization of the county of Cattaraugus to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-21Assemblysubstituted by s6147
2023-06-21Assemblyrules report cal.881
2023-06-21Assemblyreported
2023-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-04-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06147 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.329

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback