NY A06385 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - substituted by s5023a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the expiration of the authorization to the county of Genesee to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax from 11/30/2023 to 11/30/2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the expiration of the authorization to the county of Genesee to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax from 11/30/2023 to 11/30/2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31Assemblysubstituted by s5023a
2023-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.379
2023-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.379
2023-05-30Assemblyreported
2023-05-30Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-04-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05023 (Same As) 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.235

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback