NY A06384 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.401
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the Ocean Beach Volunteer and Exempt Firefighters' Benevolent Association, Inc's purpose and use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the Ocean Beach Volunteer and Exempt Firefighters' Benevolent Association, Inc's purpose and use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-15Assemblysigned chap.401
2023-09-07Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1851
2023-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6262A
2023-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.642
2023-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.642
2023-06-07Assemblyreported
2023-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-10Assemblyprint number 6384a
2023-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2023-04-06Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S06262 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6384A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6384
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06384&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06384
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06384&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06384A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06384&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06384&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06384&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06384&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6384#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback