NY A06384 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4961b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4961b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including certain employees who were employed in public service but became members of a retirement system at a later date for eligibility for those who participated in the World Trade Center rescue, recovery or cleanup operations.
Title
Relates to including certain employees who were employed in public service but became members of a retirement system at a later date for eligibility for those who participated in the World Trade Center rescue, recovery or cleanup operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s4961b |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.582 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 6384a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04961 (Same As) 2021-09-10 - SIGNED CHAP.424