NY A06378 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s6549b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s6549b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Wales as the "Petty Officer Robert Segool Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Wales as the "Petty Officer Robert Segool Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | substituted by s6549b |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.190 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | print number 6378c |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | print number 6378b |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | print number 6378a |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06549 (Same As) 2022-08-12 - SIGNED CHAP.499