NY A06376 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of existing village sewer rents for certain infrastructure payments in the village of Baldwinsville.
Title
Authorizes the use of existing village sewer rents for certain infrastructure payments in the village of Baldwinsville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Assembly | signed chap.198 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.756 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5405A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.131 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.131 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | print number 6376a |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05405 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6376A