NY A06375 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s2929b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s2929b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating certain zip codes as cease and desist zones; directs the secretary of state to designate certain zip codes in Brooklyn as cease and desist zones.
Title
Relates to designating certain zip codes as cease and desist zones; directs the secretary of state to designate certain zip codes in Brooklyn as cease and desist zones.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s2929b |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.791 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 6375a |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02929 (Same As) 2021-11-07 - SIGNED CHAP.581