NY A06365 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8399
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8399
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that uniformed court officers and peace officers employed in the unified court system shall be entitled to accidental disability retirement if they sustain injuries as the result of a physical assault by an assailant suffered while in service.
Title
Provides that uniformed court officers and peace officers employed in the unified court system shall be entitled to accidental disability retirement if they sustain injuries as the result of a physical assault by an assailant suffered while in service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s8399 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.531 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | print number 6365a |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08399 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.131