NY A06365 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a county board of supervisors to require that a ferry operating within such county transport without charge or fee of any kind, any soldier, sailor or marine in uniform during their term of enlistment in the service of the United States.
Title
Authorizes a county board of supervisors to require that a ferry operating within such county transport without charge or fee of any kind, any soldier, sailor or marine in uniform during their term of enlistment in the service of the United States.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | print number 6365a |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04315 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 4315A