NY A06358 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions of law amending the education law relating to directing the commissioner of education to promulgate regulations limiting the engines of school vehicles to remain idling while parked or standing on school grounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions of law amending the education law relating to directing the commissioner of education to promulgate regulations limiting the engines of school vehicles to remain idling while parked or standing on school grounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-08Senate3RD READING CAL.496
2019-05-08SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2890
2019-05-07SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2019-05-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-07Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.260
2019-05-01Assemblyreported
2019-03-06Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S02890 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6358

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback