NY A06357 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - substituted by s2068
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Waives the residency requirement for the city attorney in the city of Mechanicville, Saratoga county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waives the residency requirement for the city attorney in the city of Mechanicville, Saratoga county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted by s2068
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.530
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-03-06Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S02068 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.461

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback