NY A06357 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-2)
Status: Passed on July 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-05 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the medical use of marihuana; legalizes the possession, manufacture, use, delivery, transport or administration of medical marihuana by a designated caregiver for a certified medical use; prescribes procedures for such possession, acquisition, etc. including certification of patients by their practitioner, and that, in the practitioner's professional judgment, the patient would receive therapeutic or palliative benefit from use of medical marihuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the medical use of marihuana; legalizes the possession, manufacture, use, delivery, transport or administration of medical marihuana by a designated caregiver for a certified medical use; prescribes procedures for such possession, acquisition, etc. including certification of patients by their practitioner, and that, in the practitioner's professional judgment, the patient would receive therapeutic or palliative benefit from use of medical marihuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-05Senatesigned chap.90
2014-06-24Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-20SenateMESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE
2014-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1659
2014-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7923
2014-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2014-06-19Senatereturned to senate
2014-06-19Assemblyrepassed assembly
2014-06-19Assemblymessage of necessity - 3 day message
2014-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.598
2014-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.598
2014-06-19Assemblyreported
2014-06-19Assemblyprint number 6357e
2014-06-19Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to rules
2014-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 6357d
2014-06-16Assemblyrecommitted to rules
2014-06-09Assemblyamended on third reading 6357c
2014-06-09Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2014-06-09AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-09Senaterecalled from senate
2014-05-27SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2014-05-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-05-27Assemblypassed assembly
2014-05-27Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.41
2014-05-27Assemblyrules report cal.41
2014-05-27Assemblyreported
2014-05-27Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-05-21Assemblyprint number 6357b
2014-05-21Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2014-05-20Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-01-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to health
2013-06-17Assemblyamended on third reading 6357a
2013-06-17Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2013-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-17Senaterecalled from senate
2013-06-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2013-06-03Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2013-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.477
2013-05-29Assemblyreported
2013-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2013-04-16Assemblyreported referred to codes
2013-03-26Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04406 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4406D
S07923 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6357E

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06357&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06357&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06357
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06357&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06357A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06357&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06357B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06357&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06357C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06357&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06357D
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06357&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06357E
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06357&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback