NY A06356 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms transportation contracts for the Baldwin Union Free school district.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms transportation contracts for the Baldwin Union Free school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Assembly | tabled |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | vetoed memo.39 |
2021-09-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1021 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5563B |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.130 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.130 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | print number 6356b |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | print number 6356a |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05563 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6356B