NY A06351 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - print number 6351c
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - print number 6351c
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a retired member to change his or her option election or designate a new beneficiary where the beneficiary has been convicted of a family offense.
Title
Permits a retired member to change his or her option election or designate a new beneficiary where the beneficiary has been convicted of a family offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Assembly | print number 6351c |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | print number 6351b |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | print number 6351a |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03991 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - referred to governmental employees