NY A06344 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Instructs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities to make available on the office website, information regarding the process for individuals to obtain eligibility for services and to seek access to services.
Title
Instructs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities to make available on the office website, information regarding the process for individuals to obtain eligibility for services and to seek access to services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.542 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.739 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5347 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.259 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | print number 6344a |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to mental health |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05347 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.542