NY A06340 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Owego Apalachin central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Permits the Owego Apalachin central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s5380 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.581 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05380 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.353