NY A06332 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.173
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.173
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as "NYPD Det. TSgt. Joseph G. Lemm Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as "NYPD Det. TSgt. Joseph G. Lemm Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.173 |
2019-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.364 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6332a |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4588A |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.409 |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4588a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.364 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.364 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 6332a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04588 (Same As) 2019-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.173