NY A06328 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Subjects to taxation the possessory interest of a private individual or corporation which uses real property owned by the United States or the state, except for real property owned by public authorities, for business purposes; excludes private property where the use is for a concession available to the general public located on property, such as parks, available for the use of the general public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subjects to taxation the possessory interest of a private individual or corporation which uses real property owned by the United States or the state, except for real property owned by public authorities, for business purposes; excludes private property where the use is for a concession available to the general public located on property, such as parks, available for the use of the general public.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2023-06-02Assemblyprint number 6328a
2023-06-02Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2023-04-05Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S02774 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback