NY A06323 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes care and services provided by licensed mental health practitioners eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.
Title
Makes care and services provided by licensed mental health practitioners eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Demond Meeks [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] |
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6575 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.345 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.345 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06575 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.160