NY A06323 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an electoral voting system for electing the governor, lieutenant-governor, comptroller and attorney general.
Title
Establishes an electoral voting system for electing the governor, lieutenant-governor, comptroller and attorney general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |