NY A06321 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - substituted by s1979a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Empire State Development Corporation, in consultation with the department of agriculture and markets and the office of new Americans to conduct a study on the economic impact of the establishment of kitchen incubators; requires a report to the governor and the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Empire State Development Corporation, in consultation with the department of agriculture and markets and the office of new Americans to conduct a study on the economic impact of the establishment of kitchen incubators; requires a report to the governor and the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-23Assemblysubstituted by s1979a
2024-05-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.102
2024-05-22Assemblyrules report cal.102
2024-05-22Assemblyreported
2024-05-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-04-16Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-04-04Assemblyprint number 6321a
2024-04-04Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to economic development
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to economic development
2023-04-04Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S01979 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - VETOED MEMO.50

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6321
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06321&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06321
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06321&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06321A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06321&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06321&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06321&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback