NY A06320 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to crimes against public trust by state officers; requires such state officers salary to be suspended pending indictment for such crimes; and if convicted requires such state officers to pay back the portion of their salary beginning with the pay period immediately proceeding the date upon which the first convicted offense occurred.
Title
Relates to crimes against public trust by state officers; requires such state officers salary to be suspended pending indictment for such crimes; and if convicted requires such state officers to pay back the portion of their salary beginning with the pay period immediately proceeding the date upon which the first convicted offense occurred.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07746 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE