NY A06319 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.
Title
Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6319a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.209 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.230 |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01075 (Same As) 2022-01-19 - PRINT NUMBER 1075A