NY A06313 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - signed chap.117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - signed chap.117
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Franklin to impose a motel and hotel tax of 5 percent.
Title
Authorizes the county of Franklin to impose a motel and hotel tax of 5 percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | signed chap.117 |
2015-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1336 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.271 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01336 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6313