NY A06309 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - print number 6309a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the business income rate and expanding the small business subtraction modification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the business income rate and expanding the small business subtraction modification.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26Assemblyprint number 6309a
2020-02-26Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-03-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05954 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback