NY A06296 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - reported
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to regulation of toxic chemicals in children's products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to regulation of toxic chemicals in children's products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-05Assemblyprint number 6296a
2019-04-05Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-04Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S00501 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - 2ND REPORT CAL.

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06296&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06296&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06296
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06296&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06296A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06296&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06296&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06296&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback