NY A06286 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - substituted by s4588a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - substituted by s4588a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases certain special accidental death benefits paid to widows, widowers or the deceased member's children.
Title
Increases certain special accidental death benefits paid to widows, widowers or the deceased member's children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s4588a |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.114 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.114 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6286a |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04588 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.76