NY A06276 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.178
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requirements for a building owner to refuse to renew a lease under the real estate industry stabilization code; requires the owner of a building to be demolished to prove that he or she has the financial ability to complete demolition of the building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requirements for a building owner to refuse to renew a lease under the real estate industry stabilization code; requires the owner of a building to be demolished to prove that he or she has the financial ability to complete demolition of the building.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.178
2023-05-15Assemblyamended on third reading 6276a
2023-04-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.182
2023-04-25Assemblyreported
2023-04-03Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S02015 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES 1

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback