NY A06266 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the social services district to take no action to establish paternity or a child support order when the applicant or recipient for aid to dependent children has established good cause to refuse to cooperate.
Title
Directs the social services district to take no action to establish paternity or a child support order when the applicant or recipient for aid to dependent children has established good cause to refuse to cooperate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-15 | Assembly | vetoed memo.102 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.427 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2586A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.124 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.124 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | reference changed to social services |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | print number 6266a |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S02586 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6266A